CA AB1109 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22251, 22202, 22305, and 22452 of, and to add Section 22304.5 to, the Financial Code, relating to consumer loans.
Title
Consumer loans.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-30 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-03-29 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 22202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22304.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22305 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22341 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22452 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1109 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1109 |