CA AB1100 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 12816 to the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
State employees: workweek.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12816 | New Code | See Bill Text |