CA AB1100 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 22511.2 to the Vehicle Code, relating to electric vehicles.
Title
Electric vehicles: parking requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1100 Kamlager-Dove Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1100 Kamlager-Dove By Hertzberg (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1100 Kamlager-Dove Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-26 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1100 Kamlager-Dove By Hertzberg (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1100 Kamlager-Dove Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 819, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 3. Page 2897.). |
2019-08-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 34. Noes 4. Page 2271.). |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (July 9). |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 12). |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and TRANS. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1354.) |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 10). |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 22511.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |