CA AB1100 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 218 and 17053.5 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Taxation: homeowners’ exemption and renters’ credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. |
2017-05-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (May 15). |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-15 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 218 | Amended Code | Citation Text |