CA AB11 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-25 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Part 3.6.5 (commencing with Section 71140) to Division 34 of the Public Resources Code, relating to climate change.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Climate change: regional climate change authorities.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2021-01-21AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
2021-01-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-12-08AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 7.
2020-12-07AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code71140New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback