CA AB1097 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 439, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 439, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7599.54 of, and to add Section 7599.56 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 1633.3 of the Civil Code, relating to alarm companies.
Title
Alarm companies: electronic transactions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1097 HOLDEN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1097 Holden By Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1097 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1097 Holden By Hill (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-07 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1097 HOLDEN Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, to Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 439, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3080.). |
2015-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2618.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | From Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 7). |
2015-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1454.) |
2015-05-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 5). |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7599.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7599.56 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 1633.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1689.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |