CA AB1097 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 594, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 594, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1587 of the Fish and Game Code, relating to fish and wildlife.
Title
Fish and Game Commission: Mirage Trail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1097 NESTANDE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Special Consent #10 AB1097 Nestande By Emmerson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1097 NESTANDE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - Special Consent #10 AB1097 Nestande By Emmerson (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1097 NESTANDE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 594, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-26 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3302.). |
2013-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | From Special Consent Calendar. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2359.). |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2013-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-08 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1324.) |
2013-05-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P. & W. Read second time and amended. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 1587 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Fish and Game Code | 700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |