CA AB1097 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5201 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: license plates.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Eng [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1097 ENG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-07 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-21 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-11 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-07 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-05-26 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-02-11 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2010-01-28 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-01-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3912.) | |
2010-01-25 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2010-01-21 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (January 21). | |
2010-01-12 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 11). | |
2010-01-11 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3746.) | |
2010-01-07 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (January 7). | |
2010-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2009-04-14 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on B. & P. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To print. |