CA AB1095 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 11834.02 and 11834.23 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to alcoholism and drug abuse.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholism or drug abuse recovery or treatment facilities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2018-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2017-03-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
2017-03-21AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2017-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2017-02-17AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code11834.02Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code11834.23Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback