CA AB1094 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 555, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 555, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 21455 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: automated traffic enforcement systems.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Choi [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1094 Choi By Stone (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1094 CHOI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1094 CHOI Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 555, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-13 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2527.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-07-10 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1490.) |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3). |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21455 | Amended Code | Citation Text |