CA AB1093 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-20 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1182 and 1183 of, and to add, repeal, and add Section 1181.1 of, the Civil Code, and to amend Sections 8207.4 and 8214.1 of, to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 8200) to, and to add Article 2 (commencing with Section 8231) to, Chapter 3 of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to notaries public.
Title
Remote online notaries public.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1093 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 4. Page 3404.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1182 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1183 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8200 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8207.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8214.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |