CA AB1092 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4004 and 17500 of the Family Code, relating to child support.
Title
Child support: enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1092 Jones-Sawyer Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1092 Jones-Sawyer By Skinner (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1092 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1092 Jones-Sawyer By Skinner (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1092 Jones-Sawyer Assembly Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 28 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 3405.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 13. Page 2736.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 42. Noes 28. Page 2114.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (March 26). |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 17500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Family Code | 4004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |