CA AB1090 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 516, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 68120 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public postsecondary education: waiver of mandatory campus-based fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Senate - Special Consent AB1090 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Assembly - AB 1090 Medina Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-04 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 516, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-04 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-17AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-09-09SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2713.).
2019-09-04SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30).
2019-06-24SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-06-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-05-06SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-06AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1509.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code68120Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback