CA AB109 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-25 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-25 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R.
Pending: Senate Budget and Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2499.5 and 4970 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 208, 4971, 4984.7, 4989.68, 4996.3, and 4999.120 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to the Department of Consumer Affairs.
Title
Department of Consumer Affairs: boards: licensees: regulatory fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 109 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 109 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-25 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Joint Rules 61 and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 4299.) |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (September 10). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.) |
2019-09-06 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1182.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 208 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2499.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4970 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4971 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4984.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4989.68 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4996.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4999.120 | New Code | See Bill Text |