CA AB1088 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 829, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 829, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 23504.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to alcoholic beverages.
Title
Licensed craft distillers: direct shipping.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-06 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1088 Blanca Rubio By Alvarado-Gil (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1088 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Assembly - AB 1088 Blanca Rubio Assembly Third Reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 829, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2416.). |
2023-07-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-05-31 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 1894.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-03-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 23504.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |