CA AB1087 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 748.5 of, and to add Chapter 8.5 (commencing with Section 2845) to Part 2 of Division 1 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Environmental Justice Community Resilience Hubs Program.
Sponsors
Asm. David Chiu [D] | Sen. Josh Becker [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 7). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 2845 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 748.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |