CA AB1086 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 13 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5090.42 to the Public Resources Code, relating to parks and recreation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Off-highway vehicular recreation: Carnegie State Vehicular Recreation Area: Alameda-Tesla Expansion Area.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1086 Bauer-Kahan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 56 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1086 Bauer-Kahan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
2019-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2019-09-13SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-09-12SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 12).
2019-09-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-09-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 11). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-09-09SenateReferred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and G.O.
2019-09-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-09-09SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2019-09-09SenateJoint Rules 61 and 62 suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 9.)
2019-09-06SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2019-06-18SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-06-11SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Coms. on AGRI. and EQ.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 18. Page 1986.)
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (May 16).
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-22AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 9).
2019-04-04Assembly(Ayes 54. Noes 16. Page 1033.)
2019-04-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96(a).
2019-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2019-04-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
2019-03-28AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E.S. & T.M. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-28AssemblyReferred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and AGRI.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code568.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code5090.42New CodeSee Bill Text
Water Code13481.3Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback