CA AB1082 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 637, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 740.13 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation electrification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation electrification: electric vehicle charging infrastructure: school facilities and other educational institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-13 - Assembly - AB 1082 Burke Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1082 Burke et al. By Bradford (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1082 BURKE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 17 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 637, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-21AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2017-09-13AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 21. Page 3317.).
2017-09-13AssemblyAssembly Rule 77(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3255.)
2017-09-13AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-12SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 2782.).
2017-09-11SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-08SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2017-09-07SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-06SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-18SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 12).
2017-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-06-29SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and ED.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 1980.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-09AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-05-04AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-03AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-05-02AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 26).
2017-04-18AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2017-04-17AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2017-04-06AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (April 5).
2017-03-29AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2017-03-13AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and ED.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code740.13New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback