CA AB1080 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Chapter 2.3 (commencing with Section 2030) to Part 1 of Division 2 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public contracts: bid preferences: employee health care coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Assembly - AB 1080 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - (Y: 5 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1080 Gonzalez Fletcher By Cannella (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Labor and Industrial Relations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1080 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Vetoed by Governor.
2018-09-10AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-30AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 19. Page 6987.).
2018-08-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
2018-08-29SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 5971.).
2018-08-27SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-24SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-13SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-08-13SenateFrom inactive file.
2017-09-15SenateOrdered to inactive file at the request of Senator Monning.
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1).
2017-08-21SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-12SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-07-03SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
2017-06-29SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 27).
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Coms. on G.O. and L. & I.R.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 1915.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26).
2017-05-17AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-05-11AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-10AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
2017-05-10AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-04-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-20AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2017-04-19AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2017-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2017-03-30AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. Read second time and amended.
2017-03-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code350Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Contract Code2030New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback