CA AB1079 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 749, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 749, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 15800 and 16069 of the Probate Code, relating to trusts.
Title
Trusts: revocation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1079 Gallagher Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1079 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - AB 1079 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1079 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - AB 1079 Gallagher Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 749, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-09 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 2459.). |
2021-07-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1805.). |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2021-06-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1033.) |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 15800 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Probate Code | 16069 | Amended Code | Citation Text |