CA AB1079 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2891.1 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telecommunications: privacy protections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Assembly - AB 1079 Santiago Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20SenateOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-17SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-06-11SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2019-06-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4).
2019-05-22SenateReferred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-05-09SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-09AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1592.)
2019-05-02AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-05-01AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on C. & C.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code2891.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback