CA AB1078 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-22 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25402.13 of, and to add and repeal Section 25402.13.5 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: building standards: photovoltaic requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-23 - Assembly - AB 1078 Patterson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1078 Patterson et al. By Dahle (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1078 Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1078 Patterson et al. By Dahle (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-27 - Assembly - AB 1078 Patterson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-22 | Assembly | Vetoed by Governor. |
2022-08-30 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 67. Noes 0.). |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 20 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 4900.). |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 31). |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 61. Noes 0. Page 3410.) |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 20). |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25402.13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 25402.13.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |