CA AB1076 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 578, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 578, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 480, 480.2, and 11345.2 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 432.7 of the Labor Code, to amend Section 11105 of, and to add Sections 851.93 and 1203.425 to, the Penal Code, and to amend Section 13555 of the Vehicle Code, relating to criminal records.
Title
Criminal records: automatic relief.
Sponsors
Asm. Philip Ting [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Sen. Nancy Skinner [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-10 - Assembly - AB 1076 Ting Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 52 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1076 Ting et al. By Wiener (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1076 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1076 Ting et al. By Wiener (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1076 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 21 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 578, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 23. Page 3244.). |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2582.). |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-19 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-07 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 21. Page 2090.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 11345.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 480 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 480.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 432.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.425 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 851.93 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 13555 | Amended Code | Citation Text |