CA AB1073 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 632, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 39719.2 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Clean Truck, Bus, and Off-Road Vehicle and Equipment Technology Program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1073 GARCIA, E. Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1073 Eduardo Garcia By Lara (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Assembly - AB 1073 GARCIA, E. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 632, Statutes of 2017.
2017-10-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-09-19AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3140.).
2017-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2017-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2566.).
2017-09-05SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-09-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1).
2017-07-17SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-07-10SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-06-22SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-21SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21).
2017-06-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2017-05-24SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and EQ.
2017-05-11SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-11AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1490.)
2017-05-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2017-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 3).
2017-04-25AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-04-04AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2017-03-06AssemblyReferred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code39719.2Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback