CA AB1072 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 448, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 448, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 314.5 and 314.6 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Public Utilities Commission.
Title
Public Utilities Commission: audits and reviews.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-03 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1072 Patterson By Hill (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Result (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1072 Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - Result (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1072 Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 448, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2465.). |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2014.) |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1778.) |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | From Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 8). |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 314.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 314.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |