CA AB107 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 693, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2946 and 5132 of, to amend, repeal, and add Section 115.6 of, and to add Sections 115.8, 115.9, and 10151.3 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to licensure, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Licensure: veterans and military spouses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-08 - Assembly - AB 107 Salas Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB107 Salas et al. By Umberg (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-16 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - AB 107 Salas Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Military and Veterans Affairs] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-08 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 693, Statutes of 2021.
2021-10-08 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-15 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2021-09-08AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0.).
2021-09-08AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 42. Noes 13.)
2021-09-07AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2021-09-07SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.).
2021-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-09-02SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-26SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2021-08-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 26).
2021-08-16SenateIn committee: Referred to suspense file.
2021-07-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-14SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 14).
2021-06-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
2021-06-21SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2021-06-09SenateReferred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and M. & V.A.
2021-06-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.)
2021-05-24AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 20).
2021-05-20AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-05-12AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-29AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
2021-04-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. Read second time and amended.
2021-03-25AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on M. & V.A.
2021-03-24AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-03-23AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on M. & V.A. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (March 23).
2021-03-01AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2021-02-25AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended.
2021-02-25AssemblyReferred to Coms. on B. & P. and M. & V.A.
2021-01-11AssemblyRead first time.
2020-12-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee January 16.
2020-12-16AssemblyIntroduced. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback