CA AB1065 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 12 @ 10:00 am in John L. Burton Hearing Room
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend and repeal Section 1633.3 of the Civil Code, and to repeal and amend Section 38.6 of the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance transactions: notice: electronic transmission.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - AB 1065 Berman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-11SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 9).
2019-06-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-06-26SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2019-06-12SenateIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-24SenateReferred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
2019-04-08SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-04-08AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 1079.)
2019-04-04AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 3).
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code1633.3Repealed CodeCitation Text
Insurance Code38.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback