CA AB1065 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 803, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 853.6 and 978.5 of, to add and repeal Sections 490.4, 786.5, and 1210.6 of, to add and repeal Chapter 2.9D (commencing with Section 1001.81) of Title 6 of Part 2 of, and to add and repeal Chapter 13 (commencing with Section 13899) of Title 6 of Part 4 of, the Penal Code, relating to theft.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Theft: aggregation: organized retail theft.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-27 - Assembly - AB 1065 JONES-SAWYER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1065 Jones-Sawyer et al. By Skinner (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-14 - Senate - That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. Ordered to third reading (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1065 JONES-SAWYER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 803, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-04AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2018-08-27AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 68. Noes 6. Page 6641.).
2018-08-23AssemblyFrom committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 23).
2018-08-23AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6480.)
2018-08-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
2018-08-20AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2018-08-20SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5452.).
2018-08-14SenateFrom committee: That the measure be returned to Senate Floor for consideration. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 14)
2018-08-09SenateFrom committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-08-09SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
2018-08-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-07SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (May 25).
2018-05-25SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2018-03-13SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-02-27SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-01SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-22SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-14SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-06-01SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2017-05-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1936.)
2017-05-30AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2017-05-26AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 26).
2017-04-26AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2017-04-05AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code2713.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code490.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code786.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code853.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code978.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback