CA AB1064 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 655, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 655, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4052.8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to pharmacy.
Title
Pharmacy practice: vaccines: independent initiation and administration.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-02 - Assembly - AB 1064 Fong Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1064 Fong By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1064 Fong Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1064 Fong By Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Assembly - AB 1064 Fong Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 655, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2741.). |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 14. Page 2703.) |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2291.). |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-08-16 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1655.) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 19). |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4052.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |