CA AB1060 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 53398.51.05 to the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Enhanced infrastructure financing districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2017-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 19). |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53398.51.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |