CA AB1058 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 755.5 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to water service.
Title
Large water corporations: bill payment options.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-01 - Assembly - AB 1058 Cristina Garcia Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1058 Cristina Garcia By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1058 Cristina Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1058 Cristina Garcia By Dodd (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - AB 1058 Cristina Garcia Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 269, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-08 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2650.). |
2021-09-01 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2625.) |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 2 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2230.). |
2021-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1252.) |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 21). |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 7). |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 755.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |