CA AB1057 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 771, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 848 of the Civil Code, to amend Sections 8589.7 and 8670.55 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 42710 and 101042 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 607, 690, 3002, 3114, 3201, 3202, 3236.5, 3705, 6212, 25550, 30262, and 30404 of, to add Sections 3011 and 3205.3 to, and to repeal Section 3263 of, the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 309 and 714 of the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Sections 10783 and 13267.5 of the Water Code, relating to oil and gas.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas: Geologic Energy Management Division: wells and facilities: disposition and acquisition notices: indemnity bonds and remediation: additional security: civil penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1057 Limón Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1057 Limón et al. By Stern (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 1057 Limón Assembly Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 19 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-12 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 771, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-12 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 13. Page 3383.).
2019-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.)
2019-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 2770.).
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30).
2019-08-12SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-07-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-28SenateFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-06-06SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2019-05-24SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 43. Noes 19. Page 1977.)
2019-05-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-20AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-23AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-22AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-11AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 8).
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code848Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8589.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code8670.55Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code101042Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code42710Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25550Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3002Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3011New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code30262Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code30404Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3114Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3201Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3202Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3205.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code3236.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3263Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code3705Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code607Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code6212Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code690Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code309Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code714Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code10783Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code13267.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback