CA AB1057 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 6377.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use taxes: exemption: manufacturing.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-01 Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2011-05-16 In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
2011-05-09 In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
2011-04-14 Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Measure version as amended on April 13 corrected.
2011-04-13 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
2011-04-04 Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2011-02-20 From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2011-02-18 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code6377.1Repealed CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback