CA AB1056 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 36 and 877 of, and to add Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 820) to Title 10 of Part 2 of, the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil claims.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Asbestos Tort Trust Transparency Act and trial preferences.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2018-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2018-01-09AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-20AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2017-03-13AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-17AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
2017-02-16AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure36Amended CodeCitation Text
Code of Civil Procedure820New CodeSee Bill Text
Code of Civil Procedure877Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback