CA AB1054 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 311, 850, 850.1, 854, 854.2, 1701.1, 1701.3, 8386, and 8387 of, to amend the heading of Article 5.8 (commencing with Section 850) of Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 1 of, to amend and repeal Section 451.1 of, to add Sections 326.1, 326.2, 451.3, 1701.8, 8386.3, 8386.4, and 8389 to, to add Part 6 (commencing with Section 3280) to Division 1 of, and to repeal Sections 3291 and 3292 of, the Public Utilities Code, and to add Division 28 (commencing with Section 80500) to the Water Code, relating to public utilities, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Public utilities: wildfires and employee protection.
Sponsors
Asm. Autumn Burke [D] | Asm. Chris Holden [D] | Asm. Chad Mayes [I] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-11 - Assembly - AB 1054 Holden Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1054 Holden et al. By Dodd Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1054 Holden Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1054 Holden et al. By Dodd Urgency Clause (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1054 Holden Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 79, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12 p.m. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 63. Noes 10. Page 2618.). |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 2612.) |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 10). |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 2585.) |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 1987.). |
2019-07-08 | Senate | (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1986.) |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 8). |
2019-07-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-07-05 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 22. Noes 8. Page 1958.) |
2019-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1829.) |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1609.) |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-03-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 1701.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 1701.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 326.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 326.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 451.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 451.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8386 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8386.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8386.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8387 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 8389 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 850.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 854 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 854.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 80500 | New Code | See Bill Text |