CA AB1050 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 19431 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to horse racing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Horse Racing Board: public records: votes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2019-03-20AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code19431Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code11813Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback