CA AB1048 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 101851 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to employment.
Title
Alameda Health System Hospital Authority: labor negotiations.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-08-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1048 Cooper (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1048 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-12 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - AB 1048 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 379, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2021-09-07 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2236.). |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2021-07-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1816.) |
2021-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 29). |
2021-04-21 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 101851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |