CA AB1047 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 89, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 2814.1 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicles: motorcycle safety.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-07-02 - Assembly - AB 1047 JEFFRIES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1047 Jeffries By DeSaulnier (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-12 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Assembly - AB 1047 JEFFRIES Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2012-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-07-13 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 89, Statutes of 2012.
2012-07-13 Approved by the Governor.
2012-07-06 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:20 p.m.
2012-07-02 Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5553.).
2012-06-28 In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 30 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2012-06-28 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4179.).
2012-06-14 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-06-13 From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 12).
2012-05-30 From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2012-05-07 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2012-02-02 Referred to Com. on T. & H.
2012-01-17 In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2012-01-17 Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 5. Page 3513.)
2012-01-13 Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
2012-01-12 Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2012-01-11 From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (January 9).
2012-01-04 Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2011-02-20 From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
2011-02-18 Read first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code2814.1Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code2933Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=ab_1047&sess=1112&house=A
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1047_bill_20110218_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1047_bill_20120104_amended_asm_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1047_bill_20120112_amended_asm_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1047_bill_20120530_amended_sen_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1047_bill_20120705_enrolled.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1047_bill_20120713_chaptered.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1047_vote_20120109_000002_asm_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1047_vote_20120117_1216PM_asm_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1047_vote_20120612_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1047_vote_20120628_0936AM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/asm/ab_1001-1050/ab_1047_vote_20120702_0148PM_asm_floor.html

Bill Comments

feedback