CA AB1044 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to agriculture, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
California Agriculture Relief Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2024-01-18 | Assembly | In committee: Held under submission. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1297.) |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and NAT. RES. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 43013.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 43018.12 | New Code | See Bill Text |