CA AB1043 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 50053 of, and to add Section 50063.5 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing programs: rental housing developments: affordable rent.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1043 Bryan et al. By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-07-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Assembly - AB 1043 Bryan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 354, Statutes of 2021.
2021-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2021-09-08 Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
2021-09-01AssemblyIn Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
2021-09-01SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.).
2021-08-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-08-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2021-07-08SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-05SenateJoint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
2021-07-01SenateIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-06-16SenateReferred to Com. on HOUSING.
2021-06-07SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2021-06-03AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-06-01AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-06-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 69(b) suspended.
2021-05-27AssemblyRead third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-13AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 12).
2021-05-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-05-04AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2021-05-03AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 29).
2021-03-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2021-02-19AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 21.
2021-02-18AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code50053Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code50063.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback