CA AB1041 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 748, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 748, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12945.2 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 245.5 of the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Employment: leave.
Sponsors
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] | Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Chris Ward [D] |
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-25 - Assembly - AB 1041 Wicks Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 58 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1041 Wicks et al. By Laird (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1041 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-24 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1041 Wicks et al. By Laird (Y: 31 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-05 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1041 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 748, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-31 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 15.). |
2022-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77(a) suspended. |
2022-08-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 26 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 7. Page 5102.). |
2022-08-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-08 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2021-09-09 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener. |
2021-09-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-03 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 26). |
2021-07-05 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 16. Page 1683.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (May 20). |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2021-04-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on INS. Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and INS. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12945.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Labor Code | 245.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |