CA AB1041 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 44418 of, and to add Section 44419 to, the Education Code, relating to teachers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers: Uplift Teaching Corps Act of 2019.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-03-27AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-03-26AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code44418Amended CodeCitation Text
Education Code44419New CodeSee Bill Text
Education Code49012Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback