CA AB1041 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 30923 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Bay Area Toll Authority and oversight committee: conflict of interest.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1041 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - AB 1041 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - AB 1041 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 16, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-06-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4221.). |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 3779.) |
2018-01-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 8). |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 30923 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 11051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10632 | Amended Code | Citation Text |