CA AB1041 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 17072 of, and to add Section 17208 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal income taxes: education savings accounts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-02-01AssemblyFrom committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2016-01-31AssemblyDied pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2015-05-18AssemblyIn committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2015-05-11AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
2015-03-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
2015-02-27AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 29.
2015-02-26AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17072Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17208New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback