CA AB1041 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-02 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 116281 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to drinking water.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drinking water: private wells: county regulation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-02 From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2010-01-31 Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution.
2009-04-21 In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2009-04-02 Referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and L. GOV.
2009-03-02 Read first time.
2009-03-01 From printer. May be heard in committee March 30.
2009-02-27 Introduced. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback