CA AB1040 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-14 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 2.7 (commencing with Section 78240) to Chapter 2 of Part 48 of Division 7 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Community colleges: ethnic studies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Assembly - AB 1040 Muratsuchi Assembly Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation. |
2021-07-05 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 14. Page 1678.) |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 20). |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2021-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2021-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 8). |
2021-04-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-04-05 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2021-02-18 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 78240 | New Code | See Bill Text |