CA AB1037 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 11 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1206 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 14165.50 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to clinics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Martin Luther King, Jr. Community Hospital: clinics: licensure and regulation: exemption.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1037 Gipson Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1037 Gipson By Bradford (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Assembly - AB 1037 Gipson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0.).
2019-09-11AssemblyAssembly Rule 77 suspended.
2019-09-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-10SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-09-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-09-06SenateRead third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2019-07-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-07-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-07-08SenateFrom Consent Calendar.
2019-07-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-06-27SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-16SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-05-02SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-02AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1477.)
2019-04-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
2019-04-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 24).
2019-04-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-04-02AssemblyFrom committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended.
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code1206Amended CodeCitation Text
Welfare and Institutions Code14165.50Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback