CA AB1036 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1371.5 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 10126.6 of the Insurance Code, and to add Section 14132.04 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: emergency medical transport.
Sponsors
Asm. Isaac Bryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-04-04 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1371.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10126.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |