CA AB1036 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-13 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2105 and 2131 of, and to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 370) to Division 0.5 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections: civic outreach and voter engagement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-09 - Assembly - AB 1036 Aguiar-Curry Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1036 Aguiar-Curry et al. By Pan (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1036 Aguiar-Curry Assembly Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-13 Vetoed by Governor.
2019-09-13AssemblyEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2019-09-09AssemblySenate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 3109.).
2019-09-05AssemblyIn Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
2019-09-04SenateRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2494.).
2019-09-03SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-08-30SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-08-30SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30).
2019-08-19SenateIn committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-08-13SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-08-12SenateFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 10).
2019-07-02SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2019-06-12SenateReferred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and ED.
2019-05-30SenateIn Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
2019-05-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 2113.)
2019-05-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-21AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
2019-05-21AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (May 16).
2019-05-08AssemblyIn committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
2019-05-01AssemblyIn committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
2019-04-03AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-02AssemblyRead second time and amended.
2019-04-01AssemblyFrom committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 27).
2019-03-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on E. & R.
2019-02-22AssemblyFrom printer. May be heard in committee March 24.
2019-02-21AssemblyRead first time. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Elections Code2105Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code2131Amended CodeCitation Text
Elections Code370New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback