CA AB1036 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-03 - In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 40723.5 and 40723.6 to the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 42649.87 of the Public Resources Code, relating to solid waste.
Title
Organic waste: composting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Assembly - AB 1036 MCCARTY Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | In committee: Set, final hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1393.) |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 40723.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 40723.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42649.87 | Amended Code | Citation Text |